Ltg michael maples
WebSep 1, 2006 · Lt. Gen. Herron Nichols Maples married Mary Merla Leatherwood 26 Apr 1946 Bonham, Fannin County, Texas Son of Dewey Nelson Maples & Edna Henrietta Nichols. Herron & Mary or my 1st cousin 1x removed. Mary Merle Maples mother Dana Lee Ramsey is my grandfather sister his name is Olen Leslie Runt Ramsey. ... Maintained by Michael … Webunited states district court southern district of new york-----x center for constitutional rights,
Ltg michael maples
Did you know?
WebView the profiles of people named LtgMichael Maples on Facebook. Join Facebook to connect with LtgMichael Maples and others you may know. Facebook gives people the … WebMike Maples brings over 30 years of military experience to the Board of Directors of the DIMF. He served as the 16th Director of the Defense Intelligence Agency and commanded …
WebMichael Avery J. Ashlee Albies NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD c/o Suffolk Law School 120 Tremont Street Boston, MA 02108 (617) 573-8551 Attorneys for Plaintiffs June 30, 2006 Case M:06-cv-01791-VRW Document 333-6 Filed 07/21/2007 Page 2 of 65 WebLieutenant General Michael A. Bills, a native of New York, received his commission in December 1983 through the Army Reserve Officers’ Training Corps program at George …
WebDec 1, 2009 · LTG Michael Maples. Deputy Director.—LeLilia Long. DEFENSE LEGAL SERVICES AGENCY Pentagon, Room 3E833, 20301–1600, phone (703) 695–3341, fax 693–7278 Director/General Counsel.—Jeh C. Johnson. Principal Deputy Director.—Daniel Dell’Orto, 697–7248. DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY 8725 John J. Kingman Road, Suite … WebAug 1, 2008 · INSPECTOR GENERAL 400 Army Navy Drive, Suite 1000, Arlington VA 22202–4704, phone (703) 604–8300 fax 604–8310, hotline 1–800–424–9098, hotline fax 604–8569 Inspector General.—Thomas F. Gimble (acting). UNDER SECRETARY OF DEFENSE FOR ACQUISITION, TECHNOLOGY AND LOGISTICS Pentagon, Room 3E673, 20301, phone …
WebApr 10, 2024 · Lieutenant General Mike Maples became Director of the Defense Intelligence Agency in November 2005. The Defense Intelligence Agency is a 7,500-person combat …
WebApr 4, 2024 · Herron Nichols Maples, 87, an Army Lieutenant General who helped establish the Defense Intelligence Agency in the early 1960s and later was the Army's Inspector … kuhlman psychology and consultingWebFeb 7, 2008 · lieutenant general michael maples, director of the defense intelligence agency; mr. randall fort, assistant secretary of state for intelligence and research chaired by: representative silvestre reyes (d-tx) location: 2218 rayburn … kuhlman incorporatedWebAll Joint Staff Biographies. Lt. Gen. Dagvin R.M. Anderson. Director for Joint Force Development, J7. VIEW BIO. Jennifer J. Balisle. Vice Director for Force Structure, Resources and Assessment, J8. VIEW BIO. SEAC Ramón "CZ" Colón-López. Senior Enlisted Advisor to the Chairman of the Joint Chiefs of Staff. kuhlman construction ohioWebMichael Holmes (whistleblower) Lieutenant Colonel Michael Holmes (born 1965), [1] U.S. Army National Guard, communicated alleged disclosures regarding use of information … kuhlman station service transformerWebLtgMichael Maples is on Facebook. Join Facebook to connect with LtgMichael Maples and others you may know. Facebook gives people the power to share and makes the world … kuhlmannshof vlothoWebJul 31, 2014 · Lieutenant General Michael Maples (Ret.) Former Congressman Jim Marshall; General Gregory Martin (Ret.) Former Senator James Talent ### “Ensuring a Strong U.S. Defense for the Future: The National Defense Panel Review of the Quadrennial Defense Review” represents the consensus views of the Panel members and does not necessarily … kuhl mountain grownLieutenant General Michael David Maples, USA (born May 17, 1949) served as the 16th Director of the Defense Intelligence Agency (DIA), appointed on November 4, 2005. He was promoted to lieutenant general on November 29. Maples also commanded the Joint Functional Component Command for … See more Maples, a native of Bonham, Texas, was commissioned a Second Lieutenant of Field Artillery following graduation from the United States Military Academy in 1971. He holds a Master's degree in organizational behavior See more Maples became the commanding general of the United States Army Field Artillery Center at Fort Sill on August 23, 2001. Prior to assuming his duties as DIA Director, Maples served at … See more LTG Maples' decorations include the Defense Superior Service Award with Oak Leaf Cluster, the Legion of Merit with two Oak Leaf Clusters, the See more Other assignments include deputy commander of V Corps Artillery; senior military aide to the Secretary of the Army; successive … See more Lt. Gen. Maples has testified in Congressional hearings with regard to controversies about enhanced interrogation methods such as waterboarding. On February 27, 2008, he testified before the Senate Armed Services Committee that … See more kuhlman geoffrey family medicine